+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-524.
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33
- Third Reading Passed
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 19
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
August 7, 2015: Roll 33
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 84
August 5, 2015: Roll 19
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor