+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-40.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 267
- Third Reading Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 179
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2015: Roll 267
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 73
March 19, 2015: Roll 179
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor