+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-189.
- Enrolled
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 203
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
+ − Votes (2)
May 12, 2015: Roll 665
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 18
March 19, 2015: Roll 203
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor