+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Faulkner Amendment Offered
- Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered
- Faulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 496
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 497
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 498
- Mooney intended to vote "Nay"
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Coleman-Madison motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 539
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 348
- Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 347
- Sanford Amendment Offered
- Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 346
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
April 5, 2016: Roll 496
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 17
April 5, 2016: Roll 497
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 11
April 5, 2016: Roll 498
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
April 5, 2016: Roll 539
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2016: Roll 347
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
March 10, 2016: Roll 348
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
March 10, 2016: Roll 346
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor