+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Forwarded to Governor at 11:28 a.m. on April 3, 2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1090
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 437
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1090
- Yeas: 94
February 12, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor