+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment
- State Government first Amendment Offered
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 270
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Vote
April 16, 2019: Roll 270
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor