+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2020-199)
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2020-199.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
- Enrolled
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
- Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 582
- Scott intended to vote "Yea"
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Forwarded to Governor
- Executive Amendment Offered
- Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 735
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
- Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 478
- Clouse Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 479
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 480
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 615
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
- Albritton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Albritton first Substitute Offered
- Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 452
- Albritton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 463
- Third Reading Passed
- Engrossed
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
May 18, 2020: Roll 735
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 18, 2020: Roll 582
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 30
May 7, 2020: Roll 479
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 29
May 7, 2020: Roll 480
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 29
May 7, 2020: Roll 478
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 29
May 7, 2020: Roll 615
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 5, 2020: Roll 463
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
May 5, 2020: Roll 452
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor