+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-230)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-230.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 706
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 321
- Third Reading Passed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Roll 706
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 16
April 18, 2019: Roll 321
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor