+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Mooney intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362
- Third Reading Passed
- Signature Requested
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Brewbaker motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Engrossed
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 111
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 112
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2017: Roll 362
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
February 23, 2017: Roll 111
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 7
February 23, 2017: Roll 112
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor