+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reed Motion to Concur Adopted
- Ready to Enroll
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- HLTH Reported Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 204
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 205
- Third Reading in Second House
On March 5, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted
On February 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- HLTH Substitute Offered
- Melson motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 123
- Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered
- Melson motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote
- Coleman-Madison 2nd Amendment Offered
- Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 125
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 126
- Engrossed
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2024: Reed Motion to Concur Adopted Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 6, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 12
February 29, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 29, 2024: Melson motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 123 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 29, 2024: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 125 Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
February 29, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 126 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor