+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-276.
- Signature Requested
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 957
- Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 467
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 466
- Waggoner Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 957
- Yeas: 89
February 20, 2014: Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 466
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor