+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Judiciary second Amendment Offered
- Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Judiciary with 2 amendments
- Judiciary first Amendment Offered
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 299
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 298
- Melson Amendment Offered
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 297
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary as Favorable with 1 amendment
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2018: Roll 297
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
February 6, 2018: Roll 298
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
February 6, 2018: Roll 299
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor