+ − Effective Date
- March 29, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-181.
- Enrolled
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 635
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 295
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor