+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-241.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- England intended to vote "Abstain"
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-241)
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 734
- Third Reading Passed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 568
- Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2021: Roll 734
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 89
March 16, 2021: Roll 568
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor