+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-197.
- Enrolled
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Almond motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 815
- House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Orr motion to Concur in and Adopt adopted
- Executive Amendment Offered
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 643
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 257
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 256
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 255
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 254
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor