+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Enrolled
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Marques motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Crawford Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 22
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 23
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 40 P&PO appoints Orr, Singleton and Scofield
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Conference Committee Requested
- Marques motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 24 House appoints Marques, Lee and England House appoints
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Conference Report
- Conference Report
- Finance and Taxation General Fund second Amendment Offered
- Conference Committee on SB15 2021SS first Substitute Offered
- Finance and Taxation General Fund third Amendment Offered
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-560.
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
- Marques motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 26
- Givan intended to vote "Nay"
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 42
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On November 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Orr first Substitute Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 19
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20
- Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered
- Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 21
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 22
- Engrossed
On November 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (9)
November 4, 2021: Roll 42
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
November 4, 2021: Roll 24
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 18
November 4, 2021: Roll 26
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 25
November 4, 2021: Roll 40
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
November 4, 2021: Roll 22
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 13
November 4, 2021: Roll 23
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 15
November 2, 2021: Roll 20
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
November 2, 2021: Roll 21
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
November 2, 2021: Roll 19
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor