+ − Effective Date
- June 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-80.
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 472
- Third Reading Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 159
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 158
- Third Reading Passed
- Education Policy first Substitute Offered
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 472 Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2022: Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 158 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
February 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 159 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor