+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-477.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1354
- Third Reading Passed
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2015: Roll 1354
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 6
May 19, 2015: Roll 1058
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor