+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Forwarded to Governor at 2:04 p.m. on April 6, 2022
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 960
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Chestnut motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote
- Chestnut first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote 904
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 905
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Carried Over
- State Government 1ST Amendment Offered
- Chestnut motion to Table adopted Roll Call 692
- State Government 2ND Amendment Offered
- Chestnut motion to Table adopted Roll Call 693
- Chestnut Amendment Offered
- Chestnut motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-421.
- State Government second Amendment Offered
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 155
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 156
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote 904 Vote
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 7
April 5, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 905 Vote
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
April 5, 2022: Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 960 Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
February 9, 2022: Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 155 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
February 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 156 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor