+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-217)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-217.
- Enrolled
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 632
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 304
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Roll 632
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 88
April 18, 2019: Roll 304
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor