+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 782
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 437
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On February 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Votes (4)
April 25, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 51
April 25, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 782 Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 90
April 9, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 437 Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor