+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 12:30 p.m. on April 4, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-78.
- Signature Requested
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Nordgren intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 260
- Third Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 103
- Third Reading Passed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 260
- Yeas: 101
February 12, 2013: Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
- Yeas: 6