+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-496)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-496.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Rafferty, Bracy and Jackson intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1187
- Third Reading Passed
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 887
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2021: Roll 1187
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 11
April 8, 2021: Roll 887
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor