+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-508)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1201
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Report
- Assigned Act No. 2019-508.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Report concurrence requested
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1365
- Concurred in Conference Report
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Rafferty intended to vote "Nay"
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 5:58 p.m. on May 30, 2019
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Ledbetter motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1096 House appoints Ledbetter, Rowe and Grimsley
- Conference Committee Requested
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1176 P&PO appoints Melson, Chesteen and Beasley
- Concurrence Requested
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Drummond Amendment Offered
- Allen Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 933
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 935
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 934
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Smitherman Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 90
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 91
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Melson motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 34
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 33
- Education Policy Amendment Offered
- Education Policy Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1201
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
May 30, 2019: Roll 1365
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
May 28, 2019: Roll 1096
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2019: Roll 1176
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2019: Roll 935
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
May 23, 2019: Roll 933
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2019: Roll 934
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 16
April 2, 2019: Roll 91
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2019: Roll 90
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
March 21, 2019: Roll 33
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
March 21, 2019: Roll 34
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor