+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On May 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Boards, Agencies and Commissions Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Robbins motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 1067
- Robbins 1st Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1068
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1069
- In Conference Committee
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Boards, Agencies and Commissions 1st Substitute
- Boards, Agencies and Commissions 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On March 5, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
- Engrossed
On February 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- FRED Substitute Offered
- Gudger motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 144
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 145
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (8)
May 2, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2024: Robbins motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 1067 Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1068 Vote
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1069 Vote
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
May 2, 2024: In Conference Committee Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
February 29, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2024: Gudger motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 144 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 145 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor