+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-177)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-177.
- Enrolled
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 599
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 195
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2021: Roll 599
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 4
February 11, 2021: Roll 195
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor