+ − Effective Date
- April 14, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-415.
- Enrolled
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1000
- Third Reading Passed
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 161
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1000 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 161 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor