+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 621
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 620
- Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2017: Roll 540
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
April 13, 2017: Roll 620
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
April 13, 2017: Roll 621
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
February 21, 2017: Roll 83
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor