+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 304
- Third Reading Passed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 220
- Third Reading Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2016: Roll 304
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2016: Roll 129
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9
February 25, 2016: Roll 220
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor