+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-261)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-261.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Johnson (K) Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 651
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 652
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 755
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 158
- Third Reading Passed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2018: Roll 651
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 10
March 8, 2018: Roll 652
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 8
March 8, 2018: Roll 755
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
January 25, 2018: Roll 158
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor