+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-159)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-159.
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 483
- Third Reading Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 55
- Third Reading Passed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2018: Roll 483
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 18
January 23, 2018: Roll 55
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor