+ − Effective Date
- June 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2022-91.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 316
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rereferred from W&ME to M&VA
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Veterans and Military Affairs first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 245
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 246
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor