+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 90
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Youth Affairs as Favorable
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
+ − Vote
February 21, 2017: Roll 90
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor