+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Education and Youth Affairs Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 79
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 80
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 81
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Youth Affairs as Favorable with 1 amendment
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2017: Roll 79
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 21, 2017: Roll 80
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
February 21, 2017: Roll 81
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor