+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-146)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-146.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 637
- Concurrence Requested
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
- McMillan Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 342
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 343
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 344
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2021: Roll 637
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 8
March 9, 2021: Roll 342
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
March 9, 2021: Roll 343
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
March 9, 2021: Roll 344
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2021: Roll 193
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor