+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-200)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-200.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 636
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 310
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Mobile County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Roll 636
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 72
April 18, 2019: Roll 310
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor