+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-150)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-150.
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 396
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 209
- Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 208
- County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2018: Roll 396
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
January 30, 2018: Roll 208
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
January 30, 2018: Roll 209
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor