+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-217.
- Enrolled
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 835
- Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 351
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 835
- Yeas: 101
February 6, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor