+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-523.
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34
- Third Reading Passed
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15
- Local Legislation first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
August 7, 2015: Roll 34
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 90
August 4, 2015: Roll 15
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 17
August 4, 2015: Roll 16
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor