+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-298)
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-298.
- Enrolled
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1013
- Concurrence Requested
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
- Reynolds Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 855
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 856
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 857
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 595
- Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2021: Roll 1013
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
April 15, 2021: Roll 855
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 13
April 15, 2021: Roll 856
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 12
April 15, 2021: Roll 857
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 9
March 16, 2021: Roll 595
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor