+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-439)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-428.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-439.
- Enrolled
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Lipscomb and Wilcox intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1061
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 173
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1061
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 6
February 11, 2021: Roll 173
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor