+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92
- Third Reading Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Vote
February 21, 2017: Roll 92
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor