+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-83)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-83.
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 277
- Third Reading Passed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 54
- Third Reading Passed
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2021: Roll 277
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2021: Roll 54
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor