+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-116)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-116.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 12:36 p.m. on March 11, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 477
- Concurrence Requested
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 260
- Health Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 261
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 40
- Third Reading Passed
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2021: Roll 477
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2021: Roll 260
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 5
March 4, 2021: Roll 261
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 4
February 4, 2021: Roll 40
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor