+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-296.
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1018
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 185
- Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 184
- Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Banking and Insurance as Favorable with 1 amendment
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1018
- Yeas: 100
January 28, 2014: Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 184
- Yeas: 21
January 22, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Reported from Banking and Insurance as Favorable with 1 amendment
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor