+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-399)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2018-399.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 953
- Third Reading Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Engrossed
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 200
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 201
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2018: Roll 953
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
January 30, 2018: Roll 200
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
January 30, 2018: Roll 201
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor