+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means Education second Amendment Offered
- Ways and Means Education third Amendment Offered
- Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 3 amendments
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
- Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 745
- Third Reading Passed
- Dial Amendment Offered
- McGill Amendment Offered
- Dial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 746
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Dial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 428
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 427
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Dial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 amendment
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 746
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
March 6, 2014: Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 745
- Yeas: 31
February 20, 2014: Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 428
- Yeas: 31
February 20, 2014: Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 427
- Yeas: 30
January 15, 2014: Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 amendment
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 15, 2014: Acted on by Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 amendment
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 15, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor