+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-39)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:55 a.m. on April 11, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-39.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Estes motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor