+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by House of Origin
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules
- Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Substitute Offered
- Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 866
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 867
- Engrossed
On July 31, 0018 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor