+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Boothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2017: Roll 434
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 11
March 7, 2017: Roll 217
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor